Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 09/07/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/07/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/07/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/08/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 09/08/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/14/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/15/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/15/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/20/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/20/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/22/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/22/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/22/2011