Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/06/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/25/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/22/2012