Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/29/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/29/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/29/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/23/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/11/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/17/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/30/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/01/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/06/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/06/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/20/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/31/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/02/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/03/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/03/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/15/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/17/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/17/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/29/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/29/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/01/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/01/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/07/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/21/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/16/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 04/18/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/26/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/10/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/18/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/31/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/26/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/11/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/26/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/26/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 08/02/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/20/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/09/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/26/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/26/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/27/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/30/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/13/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/13/2012