Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/07/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/07/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/07/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/07/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/07/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/07/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/20/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/20/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/20/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/20/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/20/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/20/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/20/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/25/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/25/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/25/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/25/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/25/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/25/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/25/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/25/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/25/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/25/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/25/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/25/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/26/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/26/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/26/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/26/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/26/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/09/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/09/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/09/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/09/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/09/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/16/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/16/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/16/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/18/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/18/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/18/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/18/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/18/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/18/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/18/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/18/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/18/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/18/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/18/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/18/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/18/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/18/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/18/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/18/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/18/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/18/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/18/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/18/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/18/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/18/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/18/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/18/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/18/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/18/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/28/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/28/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/28/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/02/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/09/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/09/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/05/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/07/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/07/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/07/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/10/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/23/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/11/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/11/2011