Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/29/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 07/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 08/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/07/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/13/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/13/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/11/2012