There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Education for All Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to provide assistance for developing countries to promote quality basic education and to establish the achievement of quality universal basic education in all developing countries as an objective of United States foreign assistance policy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/29/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/29/2011Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/29/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/29/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/30/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/09/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/09/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/09/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/09/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/09/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/09/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/12/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/12/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/12/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/15/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/15/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/15/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/06/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/06/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/06/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/06/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/06/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/06/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/24/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/24/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/17/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/01/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/01/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/01/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/19/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/18/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/18/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/17/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/19/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/26/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/14/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/14/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/14/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/16/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/29/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/29/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/04/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/29/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2705.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2705. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/29/2011)

Education for All Act of 2011 - Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to state that it is U.S. policy to work with foreign countries and international and civil society organizations to achieve universal basic education by: (1) assisting developing countries and nongovernmental and multilateral organizations to provide all children with a quality basic education, and (2) promoting education as the foundation for communities' development.

Directs the President to develop a comprehensive U.S. strategy to promote quality universal basic education.

Authorizes the President to provide funds and other assistance to qualifying foreign countries to create the policies, processes, and infrastructure to develop national basic quality education plans.

Directs the Administrator of the United States Agency for International Development (USAID) to designate a Coordinator of United States Government Actions to Provide Basic Education Assistance who shall have primary responsibility for the oversight and coordination of all U.S. government resources and international activities to promote quality universal basic education.