Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/29/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/30/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/09/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/09/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/09/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/09/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/09/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/09/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/12/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/12/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/12/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/15/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/15/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/15/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/06/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/06/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/06/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/06/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/06/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/06/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/24/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/24/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/17/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/01/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/01/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/01/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/19/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/18/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/18/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/17/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/19/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/26/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/14/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/14/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/14/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/16/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/29/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/29/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/04/2012