Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/17/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/17/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/17/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/17/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/18/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/01/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/01/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/02/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/02/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/02/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/02/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/08/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/21/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/21/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/27/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/27/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/27/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/27/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/27/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/27/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/27/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/27/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/27/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/27/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/27/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/27/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/29/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/27/2012