Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 08/01/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/20/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/26/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/26/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/26/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/26/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/26/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/26/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/26/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/26/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/26/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/26/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/26/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/26/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/26/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/26/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/26/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/26/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/26/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/26/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/26/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/17/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/17/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/17/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/17/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/17/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/24/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/16/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/16/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/30/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/30/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/30/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/30/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/30/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/05/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/06/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/19/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/19/2012
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/23/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/24/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 08/01/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 08/02/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/20/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/28/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/28/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/28/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 10/09/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/17/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/19/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/30/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/30/2012