Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/26/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/26/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/26/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/26/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/26/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/26/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/26/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/12/2012