Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/25/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/15/2012