Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/23/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/15/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/06/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/06/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/19/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/18/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/01/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/06/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/06/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/24/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/09/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/31/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/31/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/31/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/06/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/06/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/19/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/21/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/26/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/01/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/01/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 08/02/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/11/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/11/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/21/2012