Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 08/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/31/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/31/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/31/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/31/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 11/01/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/05/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/06/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/06/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/07/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/07/2012