Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 09/09/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/14/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/05/2011