Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/02/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/16/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/16/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/16/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/16/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 08/16/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 08/16/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/16/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/16/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/16/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 08/16/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 08/16/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 08/16/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/16/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/16/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/19/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 08/19/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 08/19/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 09/07/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/07/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/13/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/21/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/21/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/21/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/23/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/23/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/13/2012