Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 08/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 08/05/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/14/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/12/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/12/2012