Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/17/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 12/14/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/19/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/06/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/19/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 12/11/2012