Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/12/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/11/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/11/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/01/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/08/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/29/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/29/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/21/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/18/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/18/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/08/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/08/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/06/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/11/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 09/21/2012