There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Joint Select Committee on Deficit Reduction to conduct the business of the committee in a manner that is open to the public.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/05/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
08/05/2011Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/05/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 08/12/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 08/12/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 08/12/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 08/12/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 08/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 08/12/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 08/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 08/12/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 08/12/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 08/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 08/19/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/19/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 08/19/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 08/19/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/02/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/02/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/08/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/08/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 09/08/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 09/08/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/08/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/15/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/22/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules08/05/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2796. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/05/2011)

Amends the Budget Control Act of 2011 to require each meeting of the Joint Select Committee on Deficit Reduction (except any discussing classified information) to be made open to the public and available for television coverage.