There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To revise the Federal charter for the Blue Star Mothers of America, Inc., to reflect a change in eligibility requirements for membership.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/05/2011Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-314.
08/09/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
12/05/2011Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/05/2011Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-314.
11/17/2011Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
11/17/2011Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/15/2011Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement Discharged.
08/25/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/09/2011Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/09/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/09/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 08/09/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 08/09/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/06/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/22/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/29/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/29/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/29/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/29/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/04/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/12/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/18/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 10/18/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/18/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/25/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/31/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/02/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/10/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 11/16/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/17/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/22/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/22/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/25/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/25/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 12/05/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/05/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/05/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/05/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/05/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 12/05/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary08/09/2011 Referred to
11/17/2011 Markup by
12/05/2011 Reported by H. Rept. 112-314
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement08/25/2011 Referred to
11/15/2011 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2815. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (12/05/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Revises the membership eligibility requirements of the federal charter for the Blue Star Mothers of America, Inc.

Redefines "mother" to mean a woman who filled the role of birth mother. Adds, in addition to adoptive mother and stepmother (as in the current charter), foster-mother, grandmother, or legal guardian of a person who is serving in the Armed Forces or has served in, or has been honorably discharged from it (as in the current charter).

Repeals the limitation to service in World War II or the Korean hostilities of the Armed Forces service of the eligible mother's son or daughter.

Allows the eligible mother to be a U.S. citizen living outside the United States. (Currently the charter limits membership to eligible mothers living in the United States.)