Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/09/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 08/09/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 08/09/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 08/09/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/06/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/22/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/29/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/29/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/29/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/29/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/04/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/12/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/18/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 10/18/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/18/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/25/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/31/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/02/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/10/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 11/16/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/17/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/22/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/22/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/25/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/25/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 12/05/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/05/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/05/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/05/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/05/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 12/05/2011