Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/18/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/28/2011