Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 08/30/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 08/30/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 08/30/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 08/30/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 08/30/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 08/30/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/02/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/02/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/02/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/02/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/02/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/02/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/02/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/02/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/09/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/09/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 09/09/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/09/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 09/15/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/15/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 09/15/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/15/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/15/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/21/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/21/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 09/21/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/23/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/23/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/23/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/29/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/29/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/04/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/04/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/04/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/05/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/05/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 10/12/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/12/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/12/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/12/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/12/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/12/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 10/12/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/12/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/12/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 10/14/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/14/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/14/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/14/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/14/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/14/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/18/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/18/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 10/18/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/18/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/02/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/04/2011