Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 08/30/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/21/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/21/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/21/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/29/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/29/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/29/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/29/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/29/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/29/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/29/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/29/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/29/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/29/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/29/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/06/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/06/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/06/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/06/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/11/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/11/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/24/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/24/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 10/24/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/25/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 11/25/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 11/25/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/25/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/25/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/25/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/25/2011