Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/02/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/02/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 09/02/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/08/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/12/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/12/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 09/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/14/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/14/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/14/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/22/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/22/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/22/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/22/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/22/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/11/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/11/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/11/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 10/11/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/18/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 11/30/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/02/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/08/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 01/23/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 01/23/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/23/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/31/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/31/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/21/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/21/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/05/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/06/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/21/2012