Refine your search

Showing 11 of 11 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/20/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-213.
12/20/2012 Signed by President.
12/14/2012 Presented to President.
12/12/2012 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to Senate amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S7972-7973)
12/05/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: House agreed to Senate amendments with an amendment pursuant to H. Res. 825.(consideration: CR H6626-6640; text as House agreed to Senate amendments with amendment: CR H6626-6640)
12/05/2012 Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendments with an amendment pursuant to H. Res. 825.(consideration: CR H6626-6640; text as House agreed to Senate amendments with amendment: CR H6626-6640)
09/22/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2012 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/15/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.
10/03/2011 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-229.
09/02/2011 Introduced in House