Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/02/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 09/02/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/15/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/03/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 10/14/2011