Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 09/06/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/19/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/06/2011