Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/14/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/20/2011