There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Employer Free Choice Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the rule relating to the notification of employee rights under the National Labor Relations Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/07/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/18/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
09/07/2011Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/07/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/12/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/12/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/12/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/12/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/12/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 09/14/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/14/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/14/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 09/20/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/20/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/20/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/22/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/22/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/12/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/05/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce09/07/2011 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions11/18/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2854. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/07/2011)

Employer Free Choice Act - Repeals the final rule on "Notification of Employee Rights under the National Labor Relations Act" published by the National Labor Relation Board (NLRB) in the Federal Register on August 30, 2011.

Prohibits the NLRB from promulgating or enforcing any rule that requires employers to post notices informing employees of their rights to bargain collectively under the National Labor Relations Act (NLRA) on or after enactment of this Act.

Declares that nothing in this Act shall be construed to prohibit an employer from voluntarily posting such notices.