Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 09/08/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/08/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/15/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/20/2011