Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/07/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/12/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/12/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/12/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/12/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/12/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/12/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 09/12/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/13/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/13/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/13/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/13/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/13/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/13/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/13/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/13/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/13/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/13/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 09/13/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/13/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/13/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/13/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/13/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/13/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 09/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/13/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/13/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/13/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/13/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/13/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/13/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/13/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/13/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 09/13/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/13/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/13/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 09/13/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/13/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/13/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/13/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/13/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/13/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 09/13/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 09/13/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/13/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/13/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/13/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 09/13/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/13/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 09/13/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/13/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/13/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/13/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/21/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/21/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/21/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/21/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/21/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/21/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/06/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/06/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/06/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/06/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/06/2011