Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/08/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/09/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/09/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/09/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/14/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/20/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/24/2011