Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/08/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/08/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/20/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/06/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/11/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/11/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/18/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 10/25/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/31/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/31/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/18/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/18/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/29/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/01/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/06/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/14/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/19/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/19/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/19/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/27/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/16/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/16/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/21/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/05/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/09/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/13/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/16/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/28/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/29/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/15/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/16/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/25/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 06/18/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/26/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/28/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/09/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/09/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/13/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 08/01/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/10/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/10/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/10/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/11/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/12/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/25/2012