Text: H.R.2867 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-75 (12/23/2011)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 75]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 1271]]

 UNITED STATES COMMISSION ON INTERNATIONAL RELIGIOUS FREEDOM REFORM AND 
                            REAUTHORIZATION 
                               ACT OF 2011

[[Page 125 STAT. 1272]]

Public Law 112-75
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To reauthorize the International Religious Freedom Act of 1998, and for 
         other purposes. <<NOTE: Dec. 23, 2011 -  [H.R. 2867]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: United States 
Commission on International Religious Freedom Reform and Reauthorization 
Act of 2011. 22 USC 6401 note.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``United States Commission on 
International Religious Freedom Reform and Reauthorization Act of 
2011''.
SEC. 2. ESTABLISHMENT AND COMPOSITION.

    (a) Terms.--Section 201(c) of the International Religious Freedom 
Act of 1998 (22 U.S.C. 6431(c)) is amended--
            (1) by striking paragraph (1) and inserting the following:
            ``(1) In general.--The <<NOTE: Time period.>> term of office 
        of each member of the Commission shall be 2 years. An 
        individual, including any member appointed to the Commission 
        prior to the date of the enactment of the United States 
        Commission on International Religious Freedom Reform and 
        Reauthorization Act of 2011, shall not serve more than 2 terms 
        as a member of the Commission under any 
        circumstance. <<NOTE: Expiration date.>> For any member serving 
        on the Commission on such date who has completed at least 2 full 
        terms on the Commission, such member's term shall expire 90 days 
        after such date. A member of the Commission may not serve after 
        the expiration of that member's term.''; and
            (2) by adding at the end the following new paragraph:
            ``(3) Ineligibility for reappointment.--If a member of the 
        Commission attends, by being physically present or by conference 
        call, less than 75 percent of the meetings of the Commission 
        during one of that member's terms on the Commission, the member 
        shall not be eligible for reappointment to the Commission.''.

    (b) Election of Chair.--Section 201(d) of the International 
Religious Freedom Act of 1998 (22 U.S.C. 6431(d)) is amended by 
inserting at the end the following: ``No member of the Commission is 
eligible to be elected as Chair of the Commission for a second, 
consecutive term.''.
    (c) Application of Federal Travel Regulation and Department of State 
Standardized Regulations to the Commission.--Section 201(i) of the 
International Religious Freedom Act of 1998 (22 U.S.C. 6431(i)) is 
amended by adding at the end the following: ``Members of the Commission 
are subject to the requirements set forth in chapters 300 through 304 of 
title 41, Code of Federal

[[Page 125 STAT. 1273]]

Regulations (commonly known as the `Federal Travel Regulation') and the 
Department of State Standardized Regulations governing authorized travel 
at government expense, including regulations concerning the mode of 
travel, lodging and per diem expenditures, reimbursement payments, and 
expense reporting and documentation requirements.''.
SEC. 3. APPLICATION OF ANTIDISCRIMINATION LAWS.

    (a) In General.--Section 204 of the International Religious Freedom 
Act of 1998 (22 U.S.C. 6432b) is amended by inserting after subsection 
(f) the following new subsection:
    ``(g) Application of Antidiscrimination Laws.--For purposes of 
providing remedies and procedures to address alleged violations of 
rights and protections that pertain to employment discrimination, family 
and medical leave, fair labor standards, employee polygraph protection, 
worker adjustment and retraining, veterans' employment and reemployment, 
intimidation or reprisal, protections under the Americans with 
Disabilities Act of 1990, occupational safety and health, labor-
management relations, and rights and protections that apply to employees 
whose pay is disbursed by the Secretary of the Senate or the Chief 
Administrative Officer of the House of Representatives, all employees of 
the Commission shall be treated as employees whose pay is disbursed by 
the Secretary of the Senate or the Chief Administrative Officer of the 
House of Representatives and the Commission shall be treated as an 
employing office of the Senate or the House of Representatives.''.
    (b) Pending Claims.--Any <<NOTE: 22 USC 6432b note.>> administrative 
or judicial claim or action pending on the date of the enactment of this 
Act may be maintained under section 204(g) of the International 
Religious Freedom Act of 1998, as added by subsection (a).
SEC. 4. AUTHORIZATION OF APPROPRIATIONS.

    Section 207(a) of the International Religious Freedom Act of 1998 
(22 U.S.C. 6435(a)) is amended by striking ``for the fiscal year 2003'' 
and inserting ``for each of the fiscal years 2012 through 2014''.
SEC. 5. STANDARDS OF CONDUCT AND DISCLOSURE.

    Section 208 of the International Religious Freedom Act of 1998 (22 
U.S.C. 6435a) is amended--
            (1) in subsection (c)(1), by striking ``$100,000'' and 
        inserting ``$250,000''; and
            (2) in subsection (e), by striking ``International 
        Relations'' and inserting ``Foreign Affairs''.
SEC. 6. TERMINATION.

    Section 209 of the International Religious Freedom Act of 1998 (22 
U.S.C. 6436) is amended by striking ``September 30, 2011'' and inserting 
``September 30, 2014''.
SEC. 7. REPORT ON EFFECTIVENESS OF PROGRAMS TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS 
                    FREEDOM.

    (a) In General.--Not later than 1 year after the date of the 
enactment of this Act, the Comptroller General of the United States 
shall submit to the appropriate congressional committees a report on the 
implementation of this Act and the amendments made by this Act.

[[Page 125 STAT. 1274]]

    (b) Consultation.--The Comptroller General shall consult with the 
appropriate congressional committees and nongovernmental organizations 
for purposes of preparing the report.
    (c) Matters To Be Included.--The report shall include the following:
            (1) A review of the effectiveness of all United States 
        Government programs to promote international religious freedom, 
        including their goals and objectives.
            (2) An assessment of the roles and functions of the Office 
        on International Religious Freedom established in section 101(a) 
        of the International Religious Freedom Act of 1998 (22 U.S.C. 
        6411(a)) and the relationship of the Office to other offices in 
        the Department of State.
            (3) A review of the role of the Ambassador at Large for 
        International Religious Freedom appointed under section 101(b) 
        of the International Religious Freedom Act of 1998 (22 U.S.C. 
        6411(b)) and the placement of such position within the 
        Department of State.
            (4) A review and assessment of the goals and objectives of 
        the United States Commission on International Religious Freedom 
        established under section 201(a) of the International Religious 
        Freedom Act of 1998 (22 U.S.C. 6431(a)).
            (5) A comparative analysis of the structure of the United 
        States Commission on International Religious Freedom as an 
        independent non-partisan entity in relation to other United 
        States advisory commissions, whether or not such commissions are 
        under the direct authority of Congress.
            (6) A review of the relationship between the Ambassador at 
        Large for International Religious Freedom and the United States 
        Commission on International Religious Freedom, and possible 
        reforms that would improve the ability of both to reach their 
        goals and objectives.

    (d) Definition.--In this section, the term ``appropriate 
congressional committees'' has the meaning given the term in section 3 
of the International Religious Freedom Act of 1998 (22 U.S.C. 6402).

    Approved December 23, 2011.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 2867:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 157 (2011):
            Sept. 14, 15, considered and passed House.
            Dec. 13, considered and passed Senate, amended.
            Dec. 16, House concurred in Senate amendments.

                                  <all>