Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/12/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/24/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/24/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/24/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/24/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/02/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/02/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/02/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/02/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/02/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/02/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/02/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/02/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/02/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/02/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/31/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/15/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/04/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/04/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/23/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/01/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 08/01/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/06/2012