Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/22/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/11/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/12/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/12/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/24/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 10/24/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 10/27/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/31/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/31/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/01/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/03/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 11/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/10/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/10/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/10/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/10/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/15/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/17/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/18/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/18/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/18/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/22/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/30/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/05/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 12/12/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/15/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/29/2012