Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/22/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 04/17/2012