Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/13/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/15/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/21/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 09/21/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/21/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/21/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/21/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/21/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/21/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/26/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/26/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/29/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/29/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/05/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/06/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/06/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/11/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/11/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/11/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/11/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/11/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/11/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/12/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/01/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/17/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/06/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/06/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/06/2012