Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/11/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 06/26/2012