Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/08/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/08/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/08/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/08/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/05/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/26/2011