Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/29/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/29/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/29/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/07/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/07/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/14/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/27/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/13/2012