Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/01/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/08/2012