Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/15/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 09/21/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/23/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/29/2012