Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/05/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/05/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/05/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 10/12/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/12/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/13/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/25/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/25/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/27/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/03/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/04/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 12/02/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/01/2012