Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/15/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/15/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 09/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/20/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/20/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/20/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/03/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/13/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 01/18/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/16/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/13/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/13/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/19/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/18/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/24/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/14/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew