Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/27/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/28/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/19/2012