Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/20/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/06/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/06/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/06/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/06/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/14/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/14/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/27/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/27/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/27/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/27/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/27/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/27/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/03/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/03/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/18/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/18/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/01/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/08/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/08/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 12/08/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/24/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/27/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/06/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 02/06/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/09/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/09/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/09/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/09/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/17/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/17/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/27/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/19/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/19/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/22/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/22/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/16/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 04/19/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/27/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/27/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/27/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/08/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/08/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 05/08/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/15/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/15/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/15/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/15/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/15/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/15/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 06/07/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/15/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/15/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/15/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/21/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/21/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/26/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/28/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/28/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/09/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/09/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/09/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/11/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/11/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/18/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/11/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/11/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/21/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/14/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 11/14/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/29/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/19/2012