Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/19/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/20/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/20/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 01/20/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/20/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/24/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/24/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 08/01/2012