Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/20/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/04/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/06/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/24/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/16/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/19/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/17/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/27/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/03/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/15/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/17/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/16/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/05/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/06/2012